Accounts and annual returns PROBUS GARDENS

Charity Number: 1090291
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 28 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 28 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2004 29 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 29 April 2005 On Time