FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF NIGERIA ANGLICAN COMMUNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities, provide support people of a particular ethnic origin
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Buckinghamshire
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Milton Keynes
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 07 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gershinen Paul Dajur | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kehinde Ajoni | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bishop Benjamin Ameh Enwuchola | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Archbishop Henry Chukwudum Ndukuba | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olayemi Kunle Dada | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hubert Chidi Ezirim | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CHARLES ANYANWU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHIEF SAMUEL FAKORODE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2024 | 591 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 June 2024 | 956 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ASSISTING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF NIGERIA (ANGLICAN COMMUNION) INCLUDING ITS DIOCESES AND PROVINCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON AND OTHER AREAS OF NIGERIAN SETTLEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Alderney Gardens
Northolt
UB5 5BT
- Phone:
- 02037195856
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window