ANCHOR MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a counselling services for people with martial problems, childhood trauma , depression and help for people suffering significant loss. The charity also provides seminars on subjects such as depression and communication.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 April 2002: Standard registration
- 12 February 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £8.27k | £7.18k | £6.51k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £5.21k | £5.03k | £7.50k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 6TH OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 2ND APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE AND THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN FAMILY LIFE, IN WEST SUSSEX AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT".
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX - HORSHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window