RAMSON MUMBA MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PREACHING AND TEACHING THE WORD OF GOD WITH SIMPLICITY AND UNDERSTANDING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- India
- Kenya
- South Africa
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 April 2002: Standard registration
- GET UNDERSTANDING MINISTRIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RAMSON MUMBA | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.27k | £7.85k | £6.90k | £7.99k | £6.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.25k | £7.25k | £6.84k | £7.89k | £6.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE FOURTH SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTRY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF BOOKS, BIBLES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EL SHADDAI INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN
THE HIPPODROME
NORTH END ROAD
LONDON
NW11 7RP
- Phone:
- 02083279069
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window