Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CROSS IN HAND CE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1089270
Charity reporting is up to date (309 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 May 2025 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 05 May 2025 309 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 March 2022 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 December 2020 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 December 2020 183 days late Download Open in new window