MEDICINE BUDDHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medicine Buddha Foundation has been providing spiritual and non-spiritual services to the Buddhist community since 2002. We are the only Vietnamese Buddhist temple in the greater London area. Medicine Buddha Foundation aims to advance the Buddhist religion and religious education in particular Vietnamese Mayahana Buddhism in London and the surrounding area in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Medway
- Thurrock
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Quang That Ngo | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thanh Binh Kieu | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
HONG VAN TRINH | Trustee | 23 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
QUOC HUNG NGUYEN | Trustee | 23 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRI BA NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.35k | £38.16k | £70.54k | £71.90k | £20.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.94k | £30.90k | £32.87k | £61.91k | £25.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 December 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 December 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 January 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 January 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 25TH MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR VIETNAMESE MAYAHANA BUDDHISM IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY ESTABLISHING A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR THE PRACTICE OF BUDDHISM.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - TOWER HAMLETS, NEWHAM, CAMDEN - WESTMINSTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST ALBANS HALL
ST ALBANS ROAD
DARTFORD
DA1 1TY
- Phone:
- 01322223216
- Email:
- dspdaq@virginmedia.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window