Accounts and annual returns THE EDENBRIDGE-ROMANIAN LINK

Charity Number: 1092542
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 07 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 08 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 27 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 11 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required