Accounts and annual returns COUNCIL FOR EQUALITY & HUMAN RIGHTS (NOTTINGHAM & NOTTINGHAMSHIRE) (CEHRNN)

Charity number: 1104984
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 25 February 2011 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time