THE BIRMINGHAM AFRICAN CARIBBEAN ARTISTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide opportunities for underprivileged artists to progress their practice, by developing placements to provide art and crafts workshops in and to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 23 August 2002: Standard registration
- STUDIO SELECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM CORBIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 May 2021 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF AFRICA CARIBBEAN ORIGIN BY: I) THE PROVISION OF ART WORKSHOPS FOR ALL TO ENHANCE THEIR APPRECIATION OF SUCH WITH A VIEW TO FOSTERING INTER-COMMUNITY RELATIONS. II) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED ARTISTS. (III) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A GALLERY EXHIBITING THE ARTWORK OF AFRICAN- CARIBBEAN ARTIST AND THOSE OF OTHER NATIONAL ORIGINS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 GOLDEN HILLOCK ROAD
SMALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0JU
- Phone:
- 07940435814
- Email:
- EVART@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window