Financial history THE BOWYER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1091350
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £90.70k £31.36k £60.53k £19.76k £2.98k
Total expenditure £81.80k £41.80k £56.80k £4.09k £40.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A