4 CANCER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our primary objective is to provide a wide range of respite opportunities for British families living with cancer. From family days out to longer respite breaks in the UK and abroad, we give families living with cancer something to look forward. Our respite programmes also give families the chance to spend quality time together whilst providing valuable memories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 January 2002: Standard registration
- 24 HOURS IN A LIFERAFT (Working name)
- 4CANCER (Working name)
- 4CANCER GROUP (Working name)
- BIKE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- BIKE FOR CANCER (Working name)
- BIKE4CANCER (Working name)
- BIKEFORCANCER (Working name)
- BOARD 4 CANCER (Working name)
- BOARD FOR CANCER (Working name)
- BOARD4CANCER (Working name)
- BOARDFORCANCER (Working name)
- BOAT 4 CANCER (Working name)
- BOAT FOR CANCER (Working name)
- BOAT4CANCER (Working name)
- BOATFORCANCER (Working name)
- CLIMB 4 CANCER (Working name)
- CLIMB FOR CANCER (Working name)
- CLIMB4CANCER (Working name)
- CLIMBFORCANCER (Working name)
- CRUISE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- CRUISE FOR CANCER (Working name)
- CRUISE4CANCER (Working name)
- CRUISEFORCANCER (Working name)
- CYCLE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- CYCLE FOR CANCER (Working name)
- CYCLE4CANCER (Working name)
- CYCLEFORCANCER (Working name)
- EVEREST CHALLENGE (Working name)
- FROM ME TO YOU (Working name)
- FROM ME TO YOU LETTERS (Working name)
- GOLF 4 CANCER (Working name)
- GOLF FOR CANCER (Working name)
- GOLF4CANCER (Working name)
- GOLFFORCANCER (Working name)
- INSURE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- JOHN BLOODWORTH FUND (Working name)
- JUMP 4 CANCER (Working name)
- JUMP FOR CANCER (Working name)
- JUMP4CANCER (Working name)
- LIFERAFT CHALLENGE (Working name)
- LIFERAFT MARATHON (Working name)
- LIFT 4 CANCER (Working name)
- LIFT FOR CANCER (Working name)
- LONDON TO BRIGHTON BIKE RIDE (Working name)
- LONDON TO BRIGHTON CYCLE RIDE (Working name)
- NEIL VINES TRUST (Working name)
- PADDLE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- PADDLE FOR CANCER (Working name)
- PADDLE4CANCER (Working name)
- PADDLEFORCANCER (Working name)
- RESPITE4CANCER (Working name)
- RESPITEFORCANCER (Working name)
- RIDE 4 CANCER (Working name)
- RIDER CUP (Working name)
- ROW 4 CANCER (Working name)
- ROW FOR CANCER (Working name)
- ROW4CANCER (Working name)
- ROWFORCANCER (Working name)
- RUN 4 CANCER (Working name)
- RUN FOR CANCER (Working name)
- RUN4CANCER (Working name)
- RUNFORCANCER (Working name)
- SAIL 4 CANCER (Working name)
- SAIL FOR CANCER (Working name)
- SAIL4CANCER (Working name)
- SAILFORCANCER (Working name)
- SKI 4 CANCER (Working name)
- SKI FOR CANCER (Working name)
- SKI4CANCER (Working name)
- SKIFORCANCER (Working name)
- SNOWBOARD 4 CANCER (Working name)
- SNOWBOARD FOR CANCER (Working name)
- SNOWBOARD4CANCER (Working name)
- SNOWBOARDFORCANCER (Working name)
- SURF 4 CANCER (Working name)
- SURF FOR CANCER (Working name)
- SURF4CANCER (Working name)
- SURFFORCANCER (Working name)
- SURVIVATHON (Working name)
- SURVIVEATHON (Working name)
- SWIM 4 CANCER (Working name)
- SWIM FOR CANCER (Working name)
- SWIM4CANCER (Working name)
- SWIMFORCANCER (Working name)
- TEA BY THE SEA (Working name)
- THE 4 CANCER GROUP (Working name)
- THE 4CANCER GROUP (Working name)
- THE RIDER CUP (Working name)
- TRAVEL4CANCER (Working name)
- TRAVELFORCANCER (Working name)
- TREK 4 CANCER (Working name)
- TREK FOR CANCER (Working name)
- TREK4CANCER (Working name)
- TREKFORCANCER (Working name)
- TRI 4 CANCER (Working name)
- TRI FOR CANCER (Working name)
- TRI4CANCER (Working name)
- TRIFORCANCER (Working name)
- TROPIC 4 CANCER (Working name)
- TROPIC OF CANCER (Working name)
- TROPIC OF CANCER CHALLENGE (Working name)
- TROPIC OF CANCER SAILING CHALLENGE (Working name)
- WALK 4 CANCER (Working name)
- WALK FOR CANCER (Working name)
- WALK4CANCER (Working name)
- WALKFORCANCER (Working name)
- SAIL 4 CANCER (Previous name)
- More
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Bowker | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Gill | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholson | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.10k | £30.03k | £85.24k | £56.95k | £34.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £326.60k | £67.94k | £84.98k | £153.59k | £110.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2021 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE OUTDOOR, LEISURE AND OTHER RESPITE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CANCER PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, SO THAT THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES MAY BE IMPROVED (2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY (A) FINANCING TREATMENT AND ASSOCIATED CARE AT INSTITUTIONS NATIONWIDE (B) PROMOTING INDEPENDENT RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CANCER PROVIDED THAT ALL USEFUL RESULTS ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Lavant Street
Petersfield
GU32 3EL
- Phone:
- 0300 030 4444
- Email:
- info@4cancer.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window