Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL COUNCILS UK

Charity Number: 1090137
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 23 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 04 August 2008 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 April 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 10 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 15 August 2006 On Time