SCHOOL COUNCILS UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of pupil and student participation to schools and colleges (up to sixth form level). This is achieved through the sale of resources, the provision of training activities and a membership scheme. There is a close working relationship with a wide range of Local Authorities. Research and development projects are undertaken regularly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Total income:
£603,629
Donations and legacies | £267.80k | |
Charitable activities | £333.35k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.05k | |
Other | £430 |
Total expenditure:
£767,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £757.97k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £757.97k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 January 2002: Standard registration
- 03 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £411.50k | £634.60k | £624.56k | £603.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £458.49k | £539.87k | £574.65k | £767.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £267.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £333.35k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.05k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £430 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £757.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £179.22k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £105.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 23 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 04 August 2008 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 30 April 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 10 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 15 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 11TH JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS: IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF TEACHERS, PUPILS AND OTHER PERSONS INVOLVED IN THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH AREAS AS: 1. SYSTEMS INVOLVING ALL PERSONS IN PROCESS OF ELECTED SCHOOL COUNCIL. 2. MOTIVATION AND MANAGEMENT OF GROUPS OF CHILDREN. 3. REDUCTION OF ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR. 4. ACCEPTANCE OF RESPONSIBILITY. 5. PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SCHOOL PROPERTY BY PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window