Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S IFFLEY
Charity number: 1094969
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Constance Wilkes | Chair | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clare Hayns | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Patrick David Wiles | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Mary Dixon | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Pearson | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Tyack | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIETTE GEORGINA MARCELLE Gammon | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNA DI STEFANO | Trustee | 09 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ JULIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID RICHARD BROUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN TREVOR-WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.