TIME OUT TOGETHER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Time Out Together operates the following Services to Families: A TooT Holiday Activity Scheme through School holidays A double Decker Bus providing services to Children, Young People, Parents & Toddlers and children with disability Jumicars a road safety Project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 July 2002: Standard registration
- 15 November 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.80k | £77.14k | £79.00k | £78.75k | £82.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.50k | £44.44k | £84.00k | £85.27k | £73.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 21 June 2011 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 24 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 01 April 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 26 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 02 March 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR CARERS TO PROVIDE AGE APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN TO ENHANCE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THE WHOLE FAMILY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE YEOVIL IN SOMERSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window