Financial history PULVERTAFT HAND CHARITY

Charity Number: 1090471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £71.12k £92.54k £107.97k £126.56k £117.16k
Total expenditure £102.84k £60.03k £93.84k £99.08k £111.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A