INSTITUTION OF OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve hardship amongst current and former members of the Institution and their families and dependants and former employees of the Institution, in accordance with any grant making policy of the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Angola
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Falkland Islands
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Kenya
- Kuwait
- Luxembourg
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Monaco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Singapore
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
Governance
- 07 February 2002: Standard registration
- IOSH BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Marie Isaacs | Chair | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Nancarrow | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Burfitt | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Moore | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Ozobu | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ria Sooknarine | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.89k | £13.33k | £6.33k | £3.62k | £9.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.09k | £8.39k | £2.57k | £13.41k | £6.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/04/2014 as amended on 02 Apr 2020 as amended on 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
To relieve hardship amongst current and former members of the Institution and their families and dependants and former employees of the Institution, in accordance with any grant making policy of the Charity.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTION OF OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY
& HEALTH
THE GRANGE
HIGHFIELD DRIVE
WIGSTON
LE18 1NN
- Phone:
- 01162573116
- Email:
- benevolentfund@iosh.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window