Governing document INSTITUTION OF OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 1090484

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/04/2014 as amended on 02 Apr 2020 as amended on 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
To relieve hardship amongst current and former members of the Institution and their families and dependants and former employees of the Institution, in accordance with any grant making policy of the Charity.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.