BMC ACCESS & CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment by supporting access and conservation projects and programmes that both protect the cliff and mountain environment and the wider countryside and also promote responsible and sustainable use of these environments for the public benefit of walking, climbing, hill walking and mountaineering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 2001: Standard registration
- ACCESS & CONSERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Anthony Wilson Bradbury | Chair | 16 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Matthew Richard Hutson | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROSANNA CATHERINE MOORE | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Louise Adele Stewart | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
British Mountaineering Council | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Andrew Hobbs Holland | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laetitia Jane Sterling | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert James Nolan | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.92k | £35.66k | £34.78k | £77.03k | £242.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £381.52k | £5.75k | £25.84k | £10.05k | £116.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/04/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY SUPPORTING ACCESS AND CONSERVATION PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES THAT BOTH PROTECT THE CLIFF AND MOUNTAIN ENVIRONMENT AND THE WIDER COUNTRYSIDE AND ALSO PROMOTE RESPONSIBLE AND SUSTAINABLE USE OF THESE ENVIRONMENTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF WALKING, CLIMBING, HILL WALKING AND MOUNTAINEERING. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION OF AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CLIFF, MOUNTAIN AND NATURE CONSERVATION. (C) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS, AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ON BEHALF OF THE BRITISH MOUNTAINEE
177-179 BURTON ROAD
WEST DIDSBURY
MANCHESTER
M20 2BB
- Phone:
- 08700104878
- Email:
- cath@thebmc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window