THE BRITISH HORN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society's objective is to promote and advance the education of the public in the appreciation and knowledge of music with particular reference to the horn as a solo instrument and in orchestral and chamber music. It also enables interested parties to receive a magazine and participate in festivals and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Stoker | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alana Knowles | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer C Ward | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Oliver | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kuby | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Baxendale | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Steggall | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|||||
John Lynsdale-Nock | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY KAMPEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM HUMPHRIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £11.87k | £13.62k | £13.54k | £16.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £12.01k | £8.88k | £13.18k | £22.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND APRIL 1988 AMENDED 24TH OCTOBER 1999 AND 14 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ITS APPRECIATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE HORN AS A SOLO INSTRUMENT AND IN ORCHESTRAL AND CHAMBER MUSIC. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS IT MAY PROMOTE CONCERTS, LECTURES, FESTIVALS, MEETINGS, BOOKS, MAGAZINES, PAMPHLETS AND OTHER LITERATURE. IT MAY ALSO PROVIDE, AND SEEK TO ENCOURAGE OTHERS TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS AND COMMISSIONS FOR NEW WORKS, AND UNDERTAKE OTHER PROJECTS AS APPROPRIATE..
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Westlands Road
Middlewich
Cheshire
CW10 9HN
- Phone:
- 01606252310
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window