Trustees THE BRITISH HORN SOCIETY
Charity number: 1090599

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Stoker | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alana Knowles | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer C Ward | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Oliver | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kuby | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Baxendale | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Steggall | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|||||
John Lynsdale-Nock | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY KAMPEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM HUMPHRIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.