Financial history DIAL DONCASTER

Charity number: 1103621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £429.25k £282.40k £270.62k £277.46k £277.46k
Total expenditure £457.72k £309.06k £280.98k £299.21k £299.21k
Income from government contracts £90.94k £90.00k £90.00k £92.98k £92.98k
Income from government grants N/A £121.81k £10.67k N/A N/A