TEN-EM-BEE SPORTS DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lewisham
Governance
- 05 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DONALD FAIRMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Palmer | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Baillie | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANK STANISLAUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER DUSSARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EUGENE DUSSARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.84k | £77.03k | £109.37k | £102.34k | £80.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.20k | £55.40k | £74.43k | £88.42k | £91.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.65k | £28.66k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 11TH JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 28TH JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
"THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN DOWNHAM AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE ADJACENT NEIGHBOURHOOD, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES MAY BE IMPROVED".
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVILION
120A OLD BROMLEY ROAD
DOWNHAM
BROMLEY
BR1 4JY
- Phone:
- 02083139510
- Email:
- tenembee1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
tenembee.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window