NETWORK M.E.
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide advice and support to all those affected by CFS/ME, through mutual contact, outreach, well-being class and drop-in. We also provide information packs translated in several languages and offer counselling and advocacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 January 2002: Standard registration
- 22 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NETWORK ME (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.14k | £37.64k | £32.18k | £43.20k | £46.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.37k | £38.64k | £46.99k | £48.49k | £45.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 06 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 02 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 02 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 11 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 13 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 25 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 25 July 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE SUFFERING FROM MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS THROUGH MUTUAL HELP AND SUPPORT BY PERSONAL CONTACT, MEETINGS AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window