MORLEY MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the appreciation of, and participation in music for the people of Morley and District
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 30 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Garforth | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pickles | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Connon | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Katrine Taylor | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Patricia Gatrell | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Lynne Caunt | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Frederick Lawrence | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deanna Bridie Hirst | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.76k | £6.12k | £1.45k | £5.07k | £5.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.76k | £7.62k | £3.35k | £7.22k | £7.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 July 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 April 2021 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 6 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 25 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
MORLEY, LEEDS, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
252 Woodlands Road
BATLEY
WF17 0QJ
- Phone:
- 01924476517
- Email:
- davlin252@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window