THE BRITISH STAMMERING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BSA is a charity run by people for people who stammer. We provide unbiased information on all aspects of stammering and run projects and campaigns to improve access to therapy, education and employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 January 2002: Standard registration
- BSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Georgina Francesca Weldon | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Caradog Wills | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Stewart | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Pim | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Olivia Birch | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Penny East | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Ridge | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Burrow | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Bismillah | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Taylor | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Harrison | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Johnston | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fix | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.50k | £1.07m | £293.10k | £712.72k | £286.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.42k | £298.91k | £389.98k | £554.17k | £599.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.05m | N/A | £634.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £834 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £4.31k | N/A | £66.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £4.50k | N/A | £10.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £8.38k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £830.94k | N/A | £366.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £276.10k | N/A | £499.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £22.81k | N/A | £54.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.30k | N/A | £8.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £1.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 2016 as amended on 10 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF ALL WHOSE LIVES ARE AFFECTED BY STAMMERING (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO STAMMERING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Box 140
43 Bedford Street
LONDON
WC2E 9HA
- Phone:
- 02089831003
- Email:
- mail@stamma.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window