FOUNDATION FOR MEDIEVAL GENEALOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of public understanding of medieval genealogy and prosopography, and the promotion of research into medieval genealogy. Publication of learned articles and books both printed and electronically, and the provision of data sets via our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 01 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jacqueline Harmon | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Cawley | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Edwards CBE | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE EDWARDS | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.99k | £5.70k | £4.98k | £2.98k | £6.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.66k | £5.23k | £2.94k | £5.87k | £3.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2002. as amended on 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE STUDY OF MEDIEVAL GENEALOGY AND PROSOPOGRAPHY, THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO MEDIEVAL GENEALOGY AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK HOUSE
VOWCHURCH
HEREFORD
HR2 0RB
- Phone:
- 01981550944
- Email:
- info@fmg.ac
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window