Financial history BETTWS IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1090307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.67k £12.57k £11.66k £3.80k £7.81k
Total expenditure £13.25k £6.79k £10.08k £8.45k £13.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A