BETTWS IN BLOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bettws in Bloom aims to promote the educational, leisure and environmental opportunities for our local community. We provide rooms and office space for the use of individuals, local groups and organisations for events, meetings and community activities. We also encourage volunteers to tend, maintain and use our gardens and encourage environmental and horticultural activities within our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newport City
Governance
- 30 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andi-lee Jordan | Chair | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Payne | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Helen Hobbs-Field | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jolene Gayle Martin | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Montana Louise Malone | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.67k | £12.57k | £11.66k | £3.80k | £7.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25k | £6.79k | £10.08k | £8.45k | £13.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 8 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE ENVIRONMENT AND HERITAGE OF BETTWS AND DISTRICT, THE PROMOTION OF HORTICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BETTWS AND DISTRICT AND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
BETTWS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lambourne Way
Bettws
Newport
South Wales
NP20 7TL
- Phone:
- 01633 856091
- Email:
- bettwsinbloom45@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window