HAMPSHIRE AND ISLE OF WIGHT HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Southern Health NHS Foundation Trust General Fund are FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
Governance
- 13 November 2001: Standard registration
- 15 November 2024: Funds received from 1053431 SOLENT NHS CHARITY
- BRIGHTERWAY (Working name)
- HAMPSHIRE PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (Previous name)
- HAMPSHIRE PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- HAMPSHIRE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- SOUTHERN HEALTH NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- WEST HAMPSHIRE GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- WEST HAMPSHIRE NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOUTHERN HEALTH NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £738.00k | £377.00k | £222.00k | £172.00k | £313.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06m | £263.00k | £294.00k | £295.00k | £401.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £709.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £44.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £78.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 20/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/06/2011 as amended on 26 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR SERVICES PROVIDED BY SOUTHERN HEALTH NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TATCHBURY MOUNT HOSPITAL
CALMORE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO40 2RZ
- Phone:
- 02380874034
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window