AMUR UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and conservation of endangered animal species, in particular the Amur tiger and leopard in the Far East of Russia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Russia
Governance
- 22 March 2002: Standard registration
- 23 May 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 23 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1109670 WILDLIFE VETS INTERNATIONAL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £653 | £583 | £345 | £102 | £210 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5 | £60 | £60 | £96 | £96 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ENDANGERED SPECIES OF ANIMALS IN PARTICULAR AMUR TIGERS & AMUR LEOPARDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EUROPE AND RUSSIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window