Accounts and annual returns COMMEDIA DELL'ARTE

Charity Number: 1090278
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 25 February 2013 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required