THE ASSOCIATION OF BUILDING BRIDGES CHURCHES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a learning framework to help local Christian communities grow in faith and actively share their faith with others. To benefit the local Christian communities already involved. To enable other local Christian communities to join the network. To involve contributions from beyond the local Christian community. To share learning and outcomes with the wider church and society at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- Netherlands
Governance
- 19 February 2003: Standard registration
- 26 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 26 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1110782 CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £300 | £180 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £403 | £138 | £129 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 August 2024 | 575 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14 JANUARY, 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FURTHER THE AIMS OF RELIGION. (PLEASE SEE CLAUSE D OF THE CONSTITUTION FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window