RHYTHMS OF THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is run by volunteers with the objectives of engaging people in community activity and stimulating the arts in the region through the delivery of an annual festival of music, dance, art and cuisine held in Hitchin, Hertfordshire. There is also an outreach programme which takes the ethos of the festival to groups that might otherwise not have the opportunity to experience it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Harper | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Fitzpatrick-Matthews | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phaedra Furphy | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £1.06k | £0 | £125 | £125 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.47k | £1.49k | £548 | £335 | £335 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/01/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/01/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TH ARTS(MEANING THE MUSICAL, VISUAL, LITERARY, DRAMATIC OR ANY OTHER ARTS PROVIDED IN EACH CASE THEY ARE OF RECOGNISED CULTURAL, AESTHETIC OR EDUCATIONAL VALUE). B) TO FOSTER, PROMOTE AND INCREASE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE ARTS AND SUBJECTS OF ARTISTIC MERIT, WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING OF GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND ENHANCING THE CONTRIBUTION WHICH A MULTI-RACIAL COMMUNITY HAS TO MAKE TO SOCIETY, SPECIFICALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN HERTFORDSHIRE
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Uplands Avenue
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG4 9NL
- Phone:
- 07771996218
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window