Accounts and annual returns YATTON KEYNELL CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1089895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 February 2025 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 May 2024 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required