Financial history YATTON KEYNELL CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND

Charity number: 1089895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2 £0 £0 £36 £53
Total expenditure £504 £303 £315 £0 £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A