MERCIAN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tackling issues of deprivation, poverty and social exclusion across the geographical area covered by the Diocese of Lichfield in both urban and rural communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 14 February 2002: Standard registration
- MERCIAN TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Preb Terry Bloor | Chair | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Tug Wilson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JOSEPHINE LOCKE | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
ROGER BECKETT MARSH B MET | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Jessamine Dace | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JULIE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Jonathan Richard Leigh Hill | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.66k | £96.98k | £72.46k | £214.00k | £133.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.12k | £108.10k | £95.29k | £200.50k | £209.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF INFORMATION AND TRAINING SCHEMES; THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH; THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND VOLUNTARY OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY INITIATING DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES; BUILDING CAPACITY, SUPPORT AND HELP TO THOSE THAT NEED TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND ENGAGING IN BUSINESS; PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASICS OF THE CHARITY SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO THIS MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS HOUSE
THE CLOSE
LICHFIELD
STAFFORDSHIRE
WS13 7LD
- Phone:
- 01543306054
- Email:
- info@lichfield.anglican.org
- Website:
-
merciantrust.org.uk/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window