COLTON HILLS SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF COLTON HILLS SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR DFES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £43,805 from 5 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 23 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUTINDER HERIAN | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|||||
JASPAL MADAHAR | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.37k | £116.82k | £117.98k | £131.66k | £160.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.04k | £84.04k | £97.65k | £116.10k | £110.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.56k | £43.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF COLTON HILLS COMMUNITY SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE SCHOOL') BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND SKILLS (DFES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLTON HILLS COMMUNITY SCHOOL
JEREMY ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV4 5DG
- Phone:
- 01902558420
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window