COMMUNITY VOLUNTARY SERVICE BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Voluntary Service (CVS) is a voluntary and community sector support organisation, offering a range of services, enabling local organisations and communities to make a difference.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £53,665 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Working name)
- CVS MID AND NORTH BEDS (Working name)
- COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE (MID AND NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Hilde Hendrickx | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Adrian Paul Spurrell | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Matthew James Young | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ANN NEVINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS PAT OLNEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR BIPIN SHAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £346.38k | £335.89k | £432.80k | £444.21k | £493.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.87k | £302.04k | £430.69k | £451.90k | £509.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.00k | £45.00k | £45.00k | £45.00k | £45.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £42.00k | £62.50k | £62.50k | £53.67k | £53.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 OCT 2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 JUN 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BEDFORDSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING TO CHARITIES OR FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, IN: THE FORMULATION OF APPLICATIONS FOR FUNDING OR OTHER ASSISTANCE, THE IDENTIFICATION OF POTENTIAL FUNDERS OR PARTNERS, INFORMATION ABOUT SOURCES OF FUNDING OR COLLABORATORS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CVS
43 BROMHAM ROAD
BEDFORD
MK40 2AA
- Phone:
- 01234354366
- Email:
- info@cvsbeds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window