THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST ANTHONY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship God predominantly using Greek and English. Educate children in Greek language and culture. Provide community support for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 14 March 2002: Standard registration
- THE GREEK ORHTODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST ANTHONY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
His Eminence Nikitas Lioulias | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Nectora Karayiannis | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KINIARIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISOSTOMOS KASAPIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREAS CHRISTOFOROU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THEONITSA SERGIDES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.24k | £94.15k | £99.56k | £112.00k | £86.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.77k | £87.09k | £74.33k | £87.44k | £85.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 April 2021 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 April 2021 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 2ND OCTOBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THIS CHARITY ARE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE GREEK ORTHODOX FAITH; (B) TO SUPPORT OTHER GREEK ORTHODOX CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS; (C) TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP A GREEK ORTHODOX SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SUSSEX WAY
HOLLOWAY
ISLINGTON
LONDON
N7 6RT
- Phone:
- 02072810407
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window