EASTWOOD PEOPLE'S INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community drop-in, offering coffee bar, internet job-search support and signposting to appropriate advice & support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 June 2002: Standard registration
- EASTWOOD YOUNG UNEMPLOYED PROJECT (Working name)
- EYUP (Working name)
- SCARGILL WALK CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Rowe | Chair | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Tibbitts | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Grand-Scrutton | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Stout | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Gascogne | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Watters | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Bailey | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Andrew Johnson | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Walker | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cllr. Milan Radulovic MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.07k | £14.00k | £30.12k | £6.89k | £32.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £13.00k | £18.40k | £29.92k | £21.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | £28.08k | N/A | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1981 AS AMENDED 1995, 20 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 21 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 16 OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WITH LOW INCOMES, HOMELESS AND PERSONS WITH A DRUG DEPENDENCY IN EASTWOOD AND SURROUNDING AREA 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF EASTWOOD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
EASTWOOD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 SCARGILL WALK
EASTWOOD
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 3AY
- Phone:
- 01773770875
- Email:
- epicentre36@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window