THE LONDON PEARLY KINGS AND QUEENS SOCIETY CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HELP ALL TYPES OF CHARITIES IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AS STATED IN THE CLASSIFICATION SECTION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 March 2002: Standard registration
- PEARLY KINGS AND QUEENS SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOREEN GOLDING | Chair | 18 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marshall | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Walters | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
kim Bennett | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAICE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.45k | £1.14k | £6.36k | £19.26k | £26.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.61k | £1.31k | £23.13k | £37.99k | £29.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15 FEBRUARY, 2002.
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHED PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Ashridge Crescent
Shooters Hill
London
SE18 3EA
- Phone:
- 07752481177
- Website:
-
WWW.PEARLYSOCIETY.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window