Financial history THE INTERNET MISSION

Charity number: 1092215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £12.89k £23.36k £14.36k £12.58k £18.12k
Total expenditure £11.28k £8.67k £22.86k £19.68k £13.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A