Accounts and annual returns ROBERT LE KYNG SCHOOL SUPPORTERS

Charity number: 1096505
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 May 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required