Financial history HALIFAX YOUNG SINGERS LIMITED

Charity number: 1090730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.35k £4.19k £8.41k £9.78k £11.29k
Total expenditure £13.98k £8.95k £10.25k £10.68k £12.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.08k