Trustees GRAND UNION VINEYARD CHURCH MILTON KEYNES
Charity number: 1090567

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Freer | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Inwood | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dunn | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Cooper | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholas Lee | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Desmond Morley | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.