HYNDBURN STRAY DOGS IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Find new homes for stray dogs. Pay for vetinary treatment for dogs. Provide free neutering and spaying. Microchipping service. General help and advice on canine welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 22 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HYNDBURN STRAY DOGS IN NEED | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Eastwood | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MARIE HESKETH | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOE HESKETH | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WOOD | Trustee | 20 June 1992 |
|
|
||||
KELLY LEE BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER HESKETH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA EASTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUNCAN HESKETH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN DAVID BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HARTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.13k | £22.36k | £53.12k | £2.65k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.05k | £41.15k | £33.38k | £19.29k | £18.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £12.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2020
(These accounts |
31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 13 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN THE BOROUGH OF HYNDBURN BY REASON OF BEING STRAY, INJURED, NEGLECTED OR UNWANTED, TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO AND SUFFERING OF ANIMALS
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF HYNDBURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Norden View
Rishton
Blackburn
BB1 4EB
- Phone:
- 01254875990
- Email:
- CLLARNER@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window