GENERATE TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of young people aged 8-25 years primarily but not exclusively in Cumbria, Cumberland & North of England by associating with the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of l
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 November 2004: Standard registration
- 24 October 2013: Removed (Removed by application)
- GENERATE (Working name)
- GENERATE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2005 | 31/08/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 8 - 25 YEARS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN CUMBRIA, CUMBERLAND AND THE NORTH F ENGLAND BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA, CUMBERLAND AND THE NORTH OF ENGLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window