The Order of St George The Martyr

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of charitable work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hungary
Governance
- 10 January 2003: Standard registration
- INTERNATIONAL KNIGHTLY ORDER OF ST GEORGE (Previous name)
- ORDER OF BLESSED GEORGE THE MARTYR CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE INTERNATIONAL KNIGHTLY ORDER OF SAINT GEORGE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Pocock | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Dryden | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Trevor Hambling | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Evans JP | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2022 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2014 as amended on 13 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 1
The Manor
Herringswell
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP28 6SH
- Phone:
- 01638751474
- Email:
- evanssindri@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window