GOD'S GRACE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity object is the advancement of the Christian religion, the Relief of need, poverty and distress amongst widows and orphans in the United Kingdom and in Africa. The Charity activities are to promote Africans Orphans and Widows' issues and to provide a christian and culturally sensible support; to provide spiritual support frame to French speakers living Londonwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 20 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanuelle Ekanda Mpolo | Chair | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Blaise Gondola Kambayolo | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bombo | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mpolo Ekanda | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ELIKYA MWEMBA | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR JACQUELINE MPOLO MPENGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.39k | £5.88k | £5.04k | £2.22k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £3.62k | £2.83k | £261 | £288 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 9 MARCH 2001 AND AMENDED 29 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; 2. THE RELIEF OF NEED, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONGST WIDOWS AND ORPHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 14
Silver Court
Reform Row
Tottenham
LONDON
N17 9AQ
- Phone:
- 07946009669
- Email:
- ggministrieslondon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window